Education
Current Positions
Specialization
Experience
1.Cathay Pacific Airways (06/26/1989 - 12/31/2020)
(1) Duty Airport Operations Manager / Assistant Manager of Training and Customer Relations (2018 - 2020)
(2) Assistant Manager, VIP Lounge (2016 - 2018)
(3) Assistant Manager, Taipei Centralized Load Control Department (2013 - 2016)
(4) Special Services Team Supervisor (2005 - 2013)
(5) Flight Operations Duty Supervisor (2005)
2. Part-Time Lecturer, Department of Air Transportation Management, Kainan University (02/01/2021 - 07/31/2022)
Certifications
IATA Dangerous Goods Handling Certificate
Aircraft Weight and Balance Training Assessment for L-1011 Model
Aircraft Weight and Balance Training Assessment for B747 Series
Aircraft Weight and Balance Training Assessment for B777-300 Model
Cathay Pacific Airways Cargo Training Certificate
Cathay Pacific Airways Customer Service Training Certificate
Cathay Pacific Airways First-Class VIP Lounge Service Training Certificate
AQS Certified SMS Expert & Risk Assessor
Special Achievements
Cathay Pacific Airways Taiwan Excellence Service Award 1993